NC H136 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recall Retired Business Court Judge
Title
Recall Retired Business Court Judge
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] |
Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. George Graham [D] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - A1 Torbett Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - A1 Torbett Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Ch. SL 2016-91 | |
2016-07-11 | Signed by Gov. 7/11/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2015-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |