NC H1377 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Ch. SL 2010-163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Safe Schools Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe Schools Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-30 Ch. SL 2010-163
2010-07-30 Signed By Gov. 7/30/2010
2010-07-09 Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Ratified
2010-07-08 Concurred In S/Com Sub
2010-07-08 Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010
2010-07-08 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-08 Reptd Fav To Concur
2010-07-07 Ref To Com On Judiciary II
2010-07-07 Rec To Concur S Com Sub
2010-07-07 Engrossed
2010-07-07 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-07 Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010
2010-07-07 Withdrawn From Cal
2010-07-07 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-07-07 Amend Adopted # 1
2010-07-06 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-07-06 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-05-20 Ref To Com On Judiciary II
2009-05-14 Rec From House
2009-05-14 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-05-14 Amend Adopted 1
2009-05-13 Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009
2009-05-13 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2009-05-13 Reptd Fav
2009-05-13 Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
2009-05-13 Reptd Fav
2009-04-09 Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary II
2009-04-09 Passed 1st Reading
2009-04-08 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1377&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1377v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1377v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1377v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1377v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1377v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1377v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1377v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1497
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1498
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1519

Bill Comments

feedback