NC H138 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 2:00 pm in 1124/1224 LB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Damage Jail & Prison Fire Sprinkler/Penalty

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Damage Jail & Prison Fire Sprinkler/Penalty

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-03HousePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2019
2019-05-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-25HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-20HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback