NC H1403 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Ch. SL 2010-94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Ch. SL 2010-94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Collect DNA Sample on Arrest
Title
Collect DNA Sample on Arrest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-10 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Ch. SL 2010-94 | |
2010-07-15 | Signed By Gov. 7/15/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Ratified | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-10 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-09 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-09 | Reptd Unfav For Conc | |
2010-07-09 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-07-09 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-07-08 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-07-07 | Held by Senate | |
2010-07-07 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |