NC H1429 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mortgage Guaranty Insurer Sunset Extended
Title
Mortgage Guaranty Insurer Sunset Extended
Sponsors
Rep. David Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-40 | |
2010-07-01 | Signed By Gov. 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Pres. To Gov. 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-21 | Ratified | |
2010-06-17 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-05-31 | Ref To Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-05-31 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-12 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Water Resources and Infrastructure, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |