NC H144 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Summary
Special Care Dentistry Collaboration.
Title
Special Care Dentistry Collaboration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2009-03-26 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-25 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-24 | Placed On Cal For 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-24 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2009-03-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Health | |
2009-02-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S188 (Same As) 2011-03-03 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H144 |