NC H146 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Funds for Adult Protective Services Pilot.
Title
Funds for Adult Protective Services Pilot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-03-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-02-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S189 (Same As) 2011-03-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H146 |