NC H147 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Ch. Res 2019-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm Raymond Grace/Banking Commissioner

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirm Raymond Grace/Banking Commissioner

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseCh. Res 2019-6
2019-04-04 Ratified
2019-04-03SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-04-03SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-27SenateRef To Nominations
2019-03-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-27SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-03-27HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-25HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2019
2019-03-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-21HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-25HouseRef to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-21HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback