NC H158 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 New Driver Response

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 New Driver Response

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 107 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-19 Ch. SL 2020-30
2020-06-19 Signed by Gov. 6/19/2020
2020-06-16 Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2020
2020-06-15 Ratified
2020-06-11HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-11SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-11SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-11SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/15/2020
2020-06-11SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-11HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-06-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-11HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-10SenateConf Com Appointed
2020-06-10HouseConf Com Appointed
2020-06-10HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2020-06-10HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-10HouseWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-04HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-04HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-04SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-04SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-04SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-03SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-03SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-03SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-03SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-14HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-11HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-05HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-26HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-25HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback