NC H159 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

State Search and Rescue Funding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Search and Rescue Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety
2019-03-13HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-26HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S396 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback