NC H16 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

2019 House Permanent Rules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2019 House Permanent Rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - A1 Lewis R2 For Adoption (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - A2 Alexander R2 For Adoption (Y: 54 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - A4 Jackson R2 For Adoption (Y: 53 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - A5 Jackson R2 For Adoption (Y: 54 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - A6 Jackson R2 For Adoption (Y: 53 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - A7 John R2 For Adoption (Y: 53 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 70 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseAdopted
2019-02-06HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-02-06HouseAmend Failed A7
2019-02-06HouseAmend Failed A6
2019-02-06HouseAmend Failed A5
2019-02-06HouseAmend Failed A4
2019-02-06HouseAmendment Withdrawn A3
2019-02-06HouseAmend Failed A2
2019-02-06HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-02-05HousePlaced On Cal For 02/06/2019
2019-02-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-02-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-01-31HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-01-31HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H16
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H16v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H16v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H16v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H16v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H16v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/11
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/10
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/8
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/7
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/6
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/5
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/4

Bill Comments

feedback