NC H1659 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 52-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent Domain
Title
Eminent Domain
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-29 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-29 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2010 | |
2010-06-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-24 | Serial Referral to Appropriations Stricken | |
2010-06-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |