NC H1662 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources
Pending: House Wildlife Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources
Pending: House Wildlife Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ashe Fox Trapping
Title
Ashe Fox Trapping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Wildlife Resources | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1130 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources