NC H1669 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Require Use EVAAS in Schools
Title
Require Use EVAAS in Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-110 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-02 | Pres. To Gov. 7/2/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Ratified | |
2010-06-30 | Concurred In S Amend | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-06-24 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2010-06-24 | Rec To Concur In S Amend | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-09 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-06-09 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Postponed To 6/8/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Placed On Cal For 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-13 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1139 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education