NC H1670 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-10 - Ch. SL 2010-87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-10 - Ch. SL 2010-87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
2010 Appointments Bill
Title
2010 Appointments Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-10 | Ch. SL 2010-87 | |
2010-07-10 | Ratified | |
2010-07-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-10 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-10 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-09 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-07-08 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-07-08 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |