NC H1673 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ch. SL 2010-24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ch. SL 2010-24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal Tax Certification
Title
Municipal Tax Certification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Ch. SL 2010-24 | |
2010-06-28 | Ratified | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-05-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1133 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - Ref To Com On Finance