NC H1676 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Substitute Teacher Unemployment
Title
Substitute Teacher Unemployment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. SL 2010-71 | |
2010-07-08 | Signed By Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Ratified | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-10 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2010 | |
2010-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1143 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education