NC H1678 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Ch. Res 2010-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Ch. Res 2010-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Bob Hensley
Title
Honor Bob Hensley
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Ch. Res 2010-5 | |
2010-06-08 | Ratified | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2010 | |
2010-06-07 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-13 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1137 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate