NC H1698 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Update Long-Term Care Statutes
Title
Update Long-Term Care Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. SL 2010-66 | |
2010-07-08 | Signed By Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Ratified | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1190 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref To Com On Health Care