NC H17 | 2016 | 4th Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-19 - Ch. SL 2016-126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-19 - Ch. SL 2016-126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modify Certain Appts/Employment
Title
Modify Certain Appts/Employment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-16 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 61 N: 23 NV: 13 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-12-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-12-16 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-12-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - A3 Bryan Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - A2 Bryan Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - A1 Bryan Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-12-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-12-16 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-12-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - A3 Bryan Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - A2 Bryan Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - A1 Bryan Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Ch. SL 2016-126 | |
2016-12-19 | Signed by Gov. 12/19/2016 | |
2016-12-16 | Pres. To Gov. 12/16/2016 | |
2016-12-16 | Ratified | |
2016-12-16 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-16 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-12-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-12-16 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-12-16 | Engrossed | |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2016-12-16 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-12-15 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-12-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2016-12-15 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-12-15 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-12-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/15/2016 |
2016-12-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-12-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-12-15 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2016-12-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Finance |
2016-12-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-12-14 | House | Filed |