NC H1701 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
NC Sustainable Communities Task Force
Title
NC Sustainable Communities Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1333 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget