NC H1703 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-11 - Ch. SL 2010-93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-11 - Ch. SL 2010-93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adult Day Care Criminal Record Check Process
Title
Adult Day Care Criminal Record Check Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-11 | Ch. SL 2010-93 | |
2010-07-11 | Signed By Gov. 7/11/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-10 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2010 | |
2010-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1189 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref To Com On Health Care