NC H1705 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer Guidelines for Hearing Aid Purchases
Title
Consumer Guidelines for Hearing Aid Purchases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-121 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-01 | Ref To Com On Health | |
2010-07-01 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-24 | Re-ref Com On Aging | |
2010-05-24 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Aging | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1203 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref To Com On Health Care