NC H1707 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Ch. SL 2010-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Ch. SL 2010-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
SHP/ Age-Out Dependents; Tobacco Use Testing
Title
SHP/ Age-Out Dependents; Tobacco Use Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Ch. SL 2010-3 | |
2010-06-07 | Signed By Gov. 6/7/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Pres. To Gov. 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Ratified | |
2010-06-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Employee Hospital and Medical Benefits | |
2010-06-01 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-05-26 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Rec From House | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-25 | Placed On Cal For 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-05-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Assigned To Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | |
2010-05-20 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-05-20 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |