NC H1708 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-07 - Received, not read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-07 - Received, not read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clean Marinas Amendments
Title
Clean Marinas Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Carolyn Justice [R] |
Rep. Danny McComas [R] | Rep. Alice Underhill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | Received, not read | |
2010-07-07 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-28 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Re-ref Com On Marine Resources and Aquaculture | |
2010-05-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Marine Resources and Aquaculture | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |