NC H1714 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Suspension and Revocation of Fishing Licenses
Title
Suspension and Revocation of Fishing Licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Dewey Hill [D] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] | Rep. Ray Rapp [D] |
Rep. Timothy Spear [D] | Rep. Alice Underhill [D] | Rep. William Wainwright [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Ch. SL 2010-145 | |
2010-07-22 | Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-05-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Marine Resources and Aquaculture, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1269 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources