NC H1720 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extend Zoo Funds & Org. Study Committee
Title
Extend Zoo Funds & Org. Study Committee
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Brubaker [R] | Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] |
Rep. Marian McLawhorn [D] | Rep. Cullie Tarleton [D] | Rep. Edith Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-01 | Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-01 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1179 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate