NC H1722 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Ch. Res 2010-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Ch. Res 2010-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Pitt County's 250th Anniversary
Title
Pitt County's 250th Anniversary
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Marian McLawhorn [D] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] | Rep. Ray Rapp [D] |
Rep. Edith Warren [D] | Rep. Arthur Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Ch. Res 2010-6 | |
2010-06-08 | Ratified | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2010 | |
2010-06-07 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Postponed To 6/7/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Placed On Cal For 6/2/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-05-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-17 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |