NC H1723 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Cabarrus Fire District Boundary Validation
Title
Cabarrus Fire District Boundary Validation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-05-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1146 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - Ch. SL 2010-17