NC H1726 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Improve Child Care Nutrition/Activity Stnds
Title
Improve Child Care Nutrition/Activity Stnds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 6 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 3 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 6 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 3 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-117 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S Amend 2 | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur S Amend 2 | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Adopted # 2 | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Failed # 1 | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-29 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-06-29 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-28 | Perfecting Amend 2 Failed | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-05-24 | Re-ref Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2010-05-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1287 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Health Care