NC H1729 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor Vehicles Law Changes
Title
Motor Vehicles Law Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-132 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub 2 | |
2010-07-06 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-24 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-24 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-22 | Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2010-06-22 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 | |
2010-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2010-06-15 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-10 | Postponed To 6/15/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-05-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1132 (Same As) 2010-05-13 - Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance