NC H1734 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DOT Powers and Duties Changes
Title
DOT Powers and Duties Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | Ch. SL 2010-165 | |
2010-08-02 | Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-06-29 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2010-06-29 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-29 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Cal For 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-05-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1159 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - Ref To Com On Transportation