NC H1740 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
General Statutes Comm. Technical Corrections
Title
General Statutes Comm. Technical Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-07-08 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-18 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1165 (Same As) 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-96