NC H1741 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animal Euthanasia Technicians
Title
Animal Euthanasia Technicians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-127 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-30 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-30 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-23 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-06-23 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1219 (Same As) 2010-05-19 - Ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance