NC H1745 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Survey Ag. Water Infrastructure Needs
Title
Survey Ag. Water Infrastructure Needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Agriculture | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Water Resources and Infrastructure, if favorable, Agriculture | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1279 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources