NC H1749 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Water Infrastructure Needs/Close Info Gaps
Title
Water Infrastructure Needs/Close Info Gaps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Water Resources and Infrastructure, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1291 (Same As) 2010-06-07 - Ref to the Com on Water Resources and Infrastructure, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources