NC H1752 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
E-NC Connectivity/Economic Development Funds
Title
E-NC Connectivity/Economic Development Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1442 (Same As) 2010-05-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate