NC H1753 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Ch. SL 2010-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Ch. SL 2010-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School Bus Railroad Crossing Exception
Title
School Bus Railroad Crossing Exception
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Ch. SL 2010-20 | |
2010-06-24 | Ratified | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-15 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-06-15 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2010 | |
2010-06-10 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1377 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education