NC H1754 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax Certification-Dare & McDowell
Title
Tax Certification-Dare & McDowell
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-44 | |
2010-07-01 | Ratified | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-23 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-06-23 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-25 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-05-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-20 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |