NC H1778 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-08 - Failed concur in S/Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-08 - Failed concur in S/Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Charter School/Retirement SHP Election
Title
Charter School/Retirement SHP Election
Sponsors
Rep. David Guice [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-28 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-17 | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1256 (Same As) 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-137