NC H1786 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-31 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-31 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Community Economic Development Funds
Title
Community Economic Development Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Larry Hall [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] | Rep. William Wainwright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-31 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-05-31 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1369 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget