NC H179 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Ch. SL 2019-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Mini-Truck Classification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mini-Truck Classification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21 Ch. SL 2019-34
2019-06-21 Signed by Gov. 6/21/2019
2019-06-14 Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2019
2019-06-13 Ratified
2019-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-05SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-20SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-18HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-13HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-05HouseRe-ref Com On Commerce
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-27HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S432 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback