NC H1790 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Transylvania County's 150th
Title
Honor Transylvania County's 150th
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-19 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |