NC H1801 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental Technical Corrections 2010
Title
Environmental Technical Corrections 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Pryor Gibson [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Cullie Tarleton [D] | Rep. Alice Underhill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1162 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources