NC H1802 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ENR Reports Consol./Tech. Corrects 2010
Title
ENR Reports Consol./Tech. Corrects 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Carney [D] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Pryor Gibson [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] |
Rep. Daniel Goforth [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Cullie Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Alice Underhill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Ch. SL 2010-142 | |
2010-07-22 | Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-28 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1163 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources