NC H1804 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Energy Policy Council Green Energy Study
Title
Energy Policy Council Green Energy Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2010-06-24 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1225 (Same As) 2010-05-19 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate