NC H1827 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative Task Force on Childhood Obesity
Title
Legislative Task Force on Childhood Obesity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1153 (Same As) 2010-06-03 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House