NC H1829 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Renewable Energy Incentives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy Incentives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-09 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-02 Ch. SL 2010-167
2010-08-02 Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010
2010-07-10 Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010
2010-07-10 Ratified
2010-07-10 Conf Report Adopted 3rd
2010-07-09 Conf Report Adopted
2010-07-09 Conf Report Adopted 2nd
2010-07-08 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-08 Conf Com Reported
2010-07-08 Conf Com Appointed
2010-07-08 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-08 Conf Report Held As Material
2010-07-08 Conf Com Reported
2010-07-08 Conf Com Appointed
2010-07-08 Failed concur in S/Com Sub
2010-07-07 Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010
2010-07-07 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-07 Reptd Unfav For Conc
2010-07-05 Ref To Com On Finance
2010-07-05 Com Sub Ruled Material
2010-07-05 Rec To Concur S Com Sub
2010-07-01 Engrossed
2010-07-01 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-01 Amend Adopted # 2
2010-06-30 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-06-30 Amend Adopted # 1
2010-06-29 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-06-29 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-06-10 Ref To Com On Finance
2010-06-10 Rec From House
2010-06-09 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-06-08 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-06-08 Amend Adopted 1
2010-06-07 Postponed To 6/8/2010
2010-06-03 Placed On Cal For 6/7/2010
2010-06-03 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-06-03 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-05-20 Ref To Com On Finance
2010-05-20 Passed 1st Reading
2010-05-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1183 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref To Com On Finance

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1829&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1829v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1829v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1829v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1829v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1829v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1829v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1829v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1829v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1415
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1416
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1440
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1441
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1575

Bill Comments

feedback