NC H1840 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Remove E-NC Sunset/Study Competing Systems
Title
Remove E-NC Sunset/Study Competing Systems
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Jim Gulley [R] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Earl Jones [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Justice [R] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. Roger West [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-24 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-01 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Rec From House | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Placed On Cal For 5/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |