NC H1847 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Promote Work Oppy. Tax Credit
Title
Promote Work Oppy. Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1233 (Same As) 2010-05-19 - Ref To Com On Commerce